AR SB845 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create The Abortion Patients’ Enhanced Safety Act And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
An Act To Create The Abortion Patients’ Enhanced Safety Act And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-04-27 | House Returned to the Senate at Sine Die Adjournment | |
2011-03-24 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-24 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Amendment # 2 and 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 and 3 | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-15 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Filed |