AR SB840 | 2011 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Senate Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
The Abortion-inducing Drugs Safety Act.
Title
The Abortion-inducing Drugs Safety Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Missy Irvin [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Senate Sine Die adjournment | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. | |
2011-04-27 | House Returned to the Senate at Sine Die Adjournment | |
2011-03-24 | House Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE | |
2011-03-24 | House RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Read the third time and passed. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Rules suspended. | |
2011-03-24 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-10 | Senate REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Filed |