AR SB830 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that SB830 is now Act 1253
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that SB830 is now Act 1253
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide Lifetime Hunting Licenses And Fishing Licenses To Certain Disabled Veterans.
Title
To Provide Lifetime Hunting Licenses And Fishing Licenses To Certain Disabled Veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Senate | Notification that SB830 is now Act 1253 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-26 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-26 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-26 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-26 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-14 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGING, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, LEGISLATIVE & MILITARY AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2013-03-13 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Filed |