AR SB828 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Arkansas Health Insurance Innovation Act Of 2015; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Create The Arkansas Health Insurance Innovation Act Of 2015; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for Study in Senate Insurance and Commerce/AR Health Reform Legislative Task Force Committee |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2015-03-17 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amendment # 1 #2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # #1 & #2 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB828 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/SB828.pdf |