AR SB817 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB817 is now Act 1520
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Require That Producing Mineral Interests Be Reappraised Annually.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require That Producing Mineral Interests Be Reappraised Annually.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-11 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-06 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB817 is now Act 1520
2013-04-23SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-23SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-11SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-11SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-11HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-11HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-10HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
2013-04-06HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-06SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-05SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2013-03-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2013-03-06SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback