AR SB8 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly 1st Special
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Notification that SB8 is now Act 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Notification that SB8 is now Act 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Dates Of The General Primary Election And Preferential Primary Election; To Amend The Time Period For Filing As A Candidate For A Primary Election; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning The Dates Of The General Primary Election And Preferential Primary Election; To Amend The Time Period For Filing As A Candidate For A Primary Election; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 66 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Motion was made by Senator Dismang to suspend the rules to place SB8 on the Calendar. Motion FAILED. (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Motion to extract SB8 from the Senate Committee on State Agencies carried. Bill was extracted from the State Agencies Committee. (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Motion was made by Senator Dismang to suspend the rules to place SB8 on the Calendar. Motion FAILED. (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Senate - Motion to extract SB8 from the Senate Committee on State Agencies carried. Bill was extracted from the State Agencies Committee. (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Senate | Notification that SB8 is now Act 4 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2015-05-28 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2015-05-28 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-05-28 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2015-05-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2015-05-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2015-05-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-05-27 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Motion was made by Senator Dismang to suspend the rules to place SB8 on the Calendar. Motion FAILED. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Motion to extract SB8 from the Senate Committee on State Agencies carried. Bill was extracted from the State Agencies Committee. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Filed |