AR SB796 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that SB796 is now Act 1302
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-18 - Notification that SB796 is now Act 1302
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify The Responsibilities Of The Arkansas Department Of Environmental Quality And The Arkansas Pollution Control And Ecology Commission With Respect To The Adoption Of State Implementation Plans.
Title
To Clarify The Responsibilities Of The Arkansas Department Of Environmental Quality And The Arkansas Pollution Control And Ecology Commission With Respect To The Adoption Of State Implementation Plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | Senate | Notification that SB796 is now Act 1302 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-11 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2013-04-08 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-04-03 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-03 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-02 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-04-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Filed |