AR SB792 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Notification that SB792 is now Act 532
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Notification that SB792 is now Act 532
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Arkansas Clean-burning Motor Fuel Development Act; And To Create The Clean-burning Motor Fuel Development Fund.
Title
To Create The Arkansas Clean-burning Motor Fuel Development Act; And To Create The Clean-burning Motor Fuel Development Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Teague [D] | Rep. Lane Jean [R] | Sen. Jason Rapert [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Notification that SB792 is now Act 532 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-03-26 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-03-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-03-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-15 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE |
2013-03-14 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Amendment # 1 and 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 AND 2 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Agriculture, Forestry and Economic Development |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Filed |