AR SB791 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Notification that SB791 is now Act 1411
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

To Reduce The Sales And Use Tax On Natural Gas And Electricity Used By Manufacturers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Reduce The Sales And Use Tax On Natural Gas And Electricity Used By Manufacturers.

Sponsors

Sen. Bill Sample [R]Rep. Randy Alexander [R]Sen. Alan Clark [R]Sen. Bryan King [R]
Rep. Betty Overbey [D]Sen. Bobby Pierce [D]Rep. Butch Wilkins [D]Rep. John Baine [D]
Sen. Bob Ballinger [R]Rep. Scott Baltz [D]Rep. Jonathan Barnett [R]Rep. Mark Biviano [R]
Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R]Rep. David Branscum [R]Rep. Mary Broadaway [D]Rep. Charles Armstrong [D]
Rep. Charlotte Douglas [R]Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R]Rep. Les Carnine [R]Rep. John Catlett [D]
Rep. Ann Clemmer [R]Rep. Harold Copenhaver [D]Rep. Bruce Cozart [R]Rep. Robert Altes [R]
Rep. Dan Douglas [R]Rep. David Meeks [R]Rep. David Whitaker [D]Sen. David Wyatt [D]
Rep. Robert Dale [R]Rep. Gary Deffenbaugh [R]Rep. Jim Dotson [R]Rep. Eddie Armstrong [D]
Sen. Eddie Cheatham [D]Rep. Jon Eubanks [R]Rep. Joe Farrer [R]Rep. Deborah Ferguson [D]
Rep. David Fielding [D]Sen. Jake Files [R]Rep. Charlene Fite [R]Sen. Gary Stubblefield [R]
Rep. Jeremy Gillam [R]Rep. Bill Gossage [R]Sen. Kim Hammer [R]Rep. Justin Harris [R]
Rep. Fonda Hawthorne [D]Sen. Bart Hester [R]Rep. Mary Hickerson [R]Sen. Jimmy Hickey [R]
Rep. David Hillman [R]Rep. Debra Hobbs [R]Rep. Monte Hodges [D]Rep. Mike Holcomb [D]
Sen. Bruce Holland [R]Rep. Karen Hopper [R]Rep. Douglas House [R]Rep. Jody Dickinson [D]
Sen. Jonathan Dismang [R]Rep. John Edwards [D]Sen. Jane English [R]Sen. Jeremy Hutchinson [R]
Sen. Johnny Key [R]Sen. Jon Woods [R]Rep. Logan Jett [R]Rep. Allen Kerr [R]
Rep. David Kizzia [D]Rep. Sheilla Lampkin [D]Rep. Andrea Lea [R]Sen. Greg Leding [D]
Rep. Homer Lenderman [D]Rep. Kelley Linck [R]Rep. Frederick Love [D]Rep. Mark Lowery [R]
Sen. Bruce Maloch [D]Rep. Andy Mayberry [R]Rep. Walls McCrary [D]Rep. Mark McElroy [D]
Rep. George McGill [D]Rep. James McLean [D]Rep. Josh Miller [R]Rep. Reginald Murdock [D]
Rep. John Payton [R]Rep. Mark Perry [D]Sen. Jason Rapert [R]Rep. James Ratliff [D]
Sen. Terry Rice [R]Rep. Chris Richey [D]Rep. Stephanie Malone [R]Rep. Stephen Meeks [R]
Rep. Sue Scott [R]Rep. Matthew Shepherd [R]Rep. Mary L. Slinkard [R]Rep. Nate Steel [D]
Rep. Tommy Thompson [D]Sen. Larry Teague [D]Sen. Uvalde Lindsey [D]Rep. John Vines [D]
Rep. Wes Wagner [D]Rep. Jeff Wardlaw [R]Rep. Bruce Westerman [R]Rep. Darrin Williams [D]
Rep. Richard Womack [R]Rep. Tommy Wren [D]Rep. Marshall Wright [D]

Roll Calls

2013-04-19 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23SenateNotification that SB791 is now Act 1411
2013-04-22SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2013-04-22SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2013-04-19SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2013-04-19SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2013-04-19HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2013-04-19HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2013-04-18HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2013-04-18HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2013-04-18HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2013-04-18SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2013-04-18SenateRead the third time and passed.
2013-04-18SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-18SenateAmendment # 3 and 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-18SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2013-04-18SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 3 and 4
2013-04-16SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2013-04-16SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-16SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-16SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
2013-04-16SenateRules suspended.
2013-04-12SenateRe-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2013-04-12SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2013-04-12SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2013-04-12SenateWithdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
2013-03-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
2013-03-05SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback