AR SB768 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Notification that SB768 is now Act 905
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Establish The Unclaimed Life Insurance Benefits Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Establish The Unclaimed Life Insurance Benefits Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-25 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-02SenateNotification that SB768 is now Act 905
2015-03-26SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2015-03-26SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2015-03-25SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2015-03-25SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2015-03-25HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2015-03-25HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2015-03-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2015-03-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
2015-03-19HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2015-03-19SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2015-03-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2015-03-19SenateRules suspended.
2015-03-18SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2015-03-18SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2015-03-17SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2015-03-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
2015-03-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback