AR SB760 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that SB760 is now Act 1058
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that SB760 is now Act 1058
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify Final Settlements Of Workers' Compensation Claims Involving Joint Petitions Under The Workers' Compensation Law That Resulted From Initiated Measure 1948, No. 4.
Title
To Clarify Final Settlements Of Workers' Compensation Claims Involving Joint Petitions Under The Workers' Compensation Law That Resulted From Initiated Measure 1948, No. 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Senate | Notification that SB760 is now Act 1058 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-29 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-29 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The vote by which SB 760 FAILED was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |