AR SB746 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The Parental Choice Pilot Program.
Title
To Establish The Parental Choice Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Johnson [R] | Sen. Jim Dotson [R] | Rep. Kenneth Bragg [R] | Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Sen. Jim Hendren [I] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 43 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in House at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-31 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2017-03-21 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-16 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |