AR SB743 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 7 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-07 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning The Definition Of The Four (4) United States Congressional Districts Of Arkansas; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning The Definition Of The Four (4) United States Congressional Districts Of Arkansas; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 35 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Upon Sounding of the Ballot, SB743 passed. (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Roll call requested. Five hands were seen. The motion to lay SB743 on the table failed. (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-05 - Senate - Upon Sounding of the Ballot, the Motion to Extract failled. (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-05 - Senate - Roll call requested. Five hands were seen. The motion carried. (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-10-07SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-10-07SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-10-07SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-10-07HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-10-07HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-10-06HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-10-06HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2021-10-06HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-10-06SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-10-06SenateEmergency Clause failed of adoption.
2021-10-06SenateMotion to Expung the Vote by which the Emergency Clause failed adoption. Motion carried.
2021-10-06SenateUpon Sounding of the Ballot, SB743 passed.
2021-10-06SenateSounding of the Ballot requested on the passage of SB743.
2021-10-06SenateEmergency Clause failed of adoption.
2021-10-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-10-06SenateThe vote by which SB743 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2021-10-06SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote by which SB743 failed to pass.
2021-10-06SenateEmergency Clause failed of adoption.
2021-10-06SenateRead the third time and failed.
2021-10-06SenateRoll call requested. Five hands were seen. The motion to lay SB743 on the table failed.
2021-10-06SenateThe motion to lay the bill on the table. The motion failed.
2021-10-06SenateRules suspended.
2021-10-06SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-10-06SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-10-06SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-10-06SenateRules suspended.
2021-10-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-10-05SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-10-05SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-10-05SenateRules suspended.
2021-10-05SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-10-05SenateUpon Sounding of the Ballot, the Motion to Extract failled.
2021-10-05SenateSounding of the Ballot requested on the passage of the Motion to Extract.
2021-10-05SenateRoll call requested. Five hands were seen. The motion carried.
2021-10-05SenateSecond voice vote was taken. The Presiding Officer ruled the motion failed.
2021-10-05SenateMotion to Extract SB743 from State Agencies Committee. Voice vote was taken.
2021-10-04SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2021-10-04SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb743&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB743/SB743100420212045.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB743/SB743100520211603.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB743/SB743100620210920.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=1116.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB743-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB743-S2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB743&rcs=3229&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB743&rcs=3230&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB743&rcs=3238&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB743&rcs=3239&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB743&rcs=3242&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB743&rcs=3244&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB743&rcs=3243&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB743&rcs=3200&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments

feedback