AR SB732 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Prohibit Coercion Of Persons To Receive The Vaccine Or Immunization For Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19); And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Prohibit Coercion Of Persons To Receive The Vaccine Or Immunization For Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19); And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Motion to place SB732 at the end of today's calendar. Motion failed. Roll call requested. Five hands were seen. Motion carried. (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-09-30 - Senate - The Presiding Officer ruled the nays had it. Roll call requested. Five hands were seen. (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Motion to place SB732 at the end of today's calendar. Motion failed. Roll call requested. Five hands were seen. Motion carried. (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Read third time and failed to pass. (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-09-30 - Senate - The Presiding Officer ruled the nays had it. Roll call requested. Five hands were seen. (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | House | Died in House Committee at Sine Die Adjournment |
2021-10-04 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-10-04 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House as passed with the Emergency Clause having failed of adoption. |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Motion to place SB732 at the end of today's calendar. Motion failed. Roll call requested. Five hands were seen. Motion carried. |
2021-10-04 | Senate | EXPUNGED |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which SB732 failed to pass. Motion carried. |
2021-10-04 | Senate | Read third time and failed to pass. |
2021-10-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-10-01 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-10-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-10-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-10-01 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-09-30 | Senate | The ruling of the Presiding Officer on the germaneness of SB732 was upheld. |
2021-09-30 | Senate | The Presiding Officer ruled the nays had it. Roll call requested. Five hands were seen. |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Motion to Appeal the ruling of the Presiding Officer's Ruling. |
2021-09-30 | Senate | The Presiding Officer ruled SB732 was germane to HCR1015. |
2021-09-30 | Senate | The germaneness of SB732 was appealed. |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Read 3rd Time |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Filed |