AR SB730 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-05 - Motion to uphold the decision of the Chair passed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Division Of Workforce Services Law To Authorize Unemployment Benefits For An Individual Who Is Terminated Solely Due To A Refusal To Be Vaccinated Against Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19); And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Division Of Workforce Services Law To Authorize Unemployment Benefits For An Individual Who Is Terminated Solely Due To A Refusal To Be Vaccinated Against Coronavirus 2019 (covid-19); And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - Senate - Voice vote on Amendment 1 to SB739. Amendment Failed. Roll call requested. Five hands were seen. (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-05HouseMotion to uphold the decision of the Chair passed
2021-10-05HouseRepresentative McKenzie objected to the Chair's ruling of SB730
2021-10-04HouseImproperly introduced not compliant with HCR1015
2021-10-04HouseRead the first time
2021-10-04HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-10-04SenateOrder immediately transmitted to the House as passed with the Emergency Clause having failed of adoption.
2021-10-04SenateEmergency Clause failed of adoption.
2021-10-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-10-04SenateRules suspended.
2021-10-04SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-10-04SenateAmendment 1 adopted and ordered engrossed.
2021-10-04SenateVoice vote on Amendment 1 to SB739. Amendment Failed. Roll call requested. Five hands were seen.
2021-10-04SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-10-01SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-09-29SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-09-27SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback