AR SB723 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning The Dates For Certain Special Elections; And To Promote Voter Turnout.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning The Dates For Certain Special Elections; And To Promote Voter Turnout.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 50 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in House at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-30 | House | Read the third time and failed. |
2017-03-29 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-29 | House | Amendment No. 1 & 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 & 2 |
2017-03-23 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2017-03-22 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | MOTION to vote SB 723 immediately, PASSED. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The vote by which SB 723 FAILED of adoption was EXPUNGED. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read third time and failed. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Upon sounding the ballot, Senate Bill 723 FAILED |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |