AR SB72 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Background Checks For School Personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend Provisions Of The Arkansas Code Concerning Background Checks For School Personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-01-28HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-01-28SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-01-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-01-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-01-11SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-01-08SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback