AR SB701 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Create The Arkansas Absentee Voting Integrity Act Of 2021.
Title
To Create The Arkansas Absentee Voting Integrity Act Of 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - the Chair determined SB701 required 18 votes. Ruling of the Chair was disputed, therefore, referred to the Body. the Rolll was called. The Body upheld the ruling of the Chair. Senator Tucker presented SB701. (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - Senate - the Chair determined SB701 required 18 votes. Ruling of the Chair was disputed, therefore, referred to the Body. the Rolll was called. The Body upheld the ruling of the Chair. Senator Tucker presented SB701. (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ruling of the Presiding Officer was disputed. Roll call on whether to uphold the ruling of the Presiding Officer. Ruling was upheld. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | The Presiding Officer ruled SB701 required 18 votes for passage. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Filed |