AR SB686 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB686 is now Act 1042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB686 is now Act 1042
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Motor Carriers; And To Regulate Ground Transportation At Municipal Airports And Regional Airports.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Motor Carriers; And To Regulate Ground Transportation At Municipal Airports And Regional Airports.
Sponsors
Sen. Lance Eads [R] | Rep. Delia Haak [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Notification that SB686 is now Act 1042 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-27 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-27 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2021-04-22 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | The vote by which SB686 Failed to Pass was expunged. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which SB686 failed to pass. Motion passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read the third time and failed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Filed |