AR SB680 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Notification that SB680 is now Act 904
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create A Tax Credit For Eligible Contributions Made To A Sponsor-granting Organization Under The Philanthropic Investment In Arkansas Kids Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create A Tax Credit For Eligible Contributions Made To A Sponsor-granting Organization Under The Philanthropic Investment In Arkansas Kids Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 40 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Motion for immediate consideration failed (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateNotification that SB680 is now Act 904
2021-04-22SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-22SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-21SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-21SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-21HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-21HouseCLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
2021-04-21HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-21HouseMotion for immediate consideration failed
2021-04-20HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-15HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE
2021-04-15HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-04-15SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-04-15SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-14SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-12SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2021-04-12SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback