AR SB668 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning A Public School District That Is Classified As Being In Need Of Level 5 - Intensive Support; And To Allow The State Board Of Education To Grant Extensions Of Its Assumption Of Authority In Certain Situations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning A Public School District That Is Classified As Being In Need Of Level 5 - Intensive Support; And To Allow The State Board Of Education To Grant Extensions Of Its Assumption Of Authority In Certain Situations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - Read the third time and failed. (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-09SenateRecommended for study in the Interim Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-08SenateThe vote by which SB668 Failed to Pass was expunged.
2019-04-08SenateMotion to Expunge the Vote
2019-04-08SenateRead the third time and failed.
2019-04-05SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-05SenateAmendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-05SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-05SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-05SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
2019-04-01SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-01SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback