AR SB661 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The Aspire Scholarship Program; To Amend The Law Regarding Casino Gaming; And To Direct Distribution Of Certain Net Casino Gaming Receipts Tax Revenues And Net Casino Gaming Receipts.
Title
To Establish The Aspire Scholarship Program; To Amend The Law Regarding Casino Gaming; And To Direct Distribution Of Certain Net Casino Gaming Receipts Tax Revenues And Net Casino Gaming Receipts.
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Ingram [D] | Rep. Deborah Ferguson [D] | Rep. Milton Nicks [D] | Sen. Ronald Caldwell [R] |
Sen. Blake Johnson [R] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R] | Sen. David Wallace [R] | Sen. James Sturch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee and placed on calendar. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-15 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Filed |