AR SB659 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Notification that SB659 is now Act 950
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify The Law Regarding The Scope Of Small Brewery Operations; To Allow Transportation Of In-house Products Between Commonly Owned Small Breweries And Breweries That Own Small Breweries; To Create Small Brewery Tap Rooms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify The Law Regarding The Scope Of Small Brewery Operations; To Allow Transportation Of In-house Products Between Commonly Owned Small Breweries And Breweries That Own Small Breweries; To Create Small Brewery Tap Rooms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06SenateNotification that SB659 is now Act 950
2017-03-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2017-03-30SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2017-03-30SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2017-03-30SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-30SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-03-28SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2017-03-28HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2017-03-28HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2017-03-22HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2017-03-20HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-20HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2017-03-20HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2017-03-17HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2017-03-16HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2017-03-16SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2017-03-16SenateRead the third time and passed.
2017-03-15SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2017-03-15SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2017-03-14SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2017-03-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
2017-03-06SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback