AR SB657 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that SB657 is now Act 1126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Notification that SB657 is now Act 1126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend The Law Concerning The Discount Available To Taxpayers For Prompt Submission Of Sales Tax Returns And Payments.
Title
An Act To Amend The Law Concerning The Discount Available To Taxpayers For Prompt Submission Of Sales Tax Returns And Payments.
Sponsors
Sen. John Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 74 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 74 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Notification that SB657 is now Act 1126 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed as amended. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2017-03-30 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-21 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-17 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-16 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |