AR SB656 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB656 is now Act 943
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Create The Data-sharing And Data-driven Decision-making Task Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Create The Data-sharing And Data-driven Decision-making Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB656 is now Act 943
2019-04-09SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-09SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-08SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-08SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-08HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-08HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-08HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-04-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE
2019-04-03HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-03SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-03SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-02SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-27SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback