AR SB654 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB654 is now Act 1002
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Law Regarding Service Animals; And To Authorize A Civil Penalty For Misrepresenting An Animal As A Service Animal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Law Regarding Service Animals; And To Authorize A Civil Penalty For Misrepresenting An Animal As A Service Animal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB654 is now Act 1002
2019-04-10SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-10SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-09SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-09SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-09HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-09HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-08HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-04-05HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-05HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-04SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-04SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-04SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-27SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-27SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback