AR SB652 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB652 is now Act 1034
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB652 is now Act 1034
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amending The Fair Sentencing For Minors Act.
Title
Amending The Fair Sentencing For Minors Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Leding [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 2 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Notification that SB652 is now Act 1034 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-26 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-26 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-21 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-21 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Filed |