AR SB651 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Notification that SB651 is now Act 942
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Amend The Maximum Number Of Passenger Motor Vehicles For Certain Institutions Of Higher Education; And To Declare An Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Amend The Maximum Number Of Passenger Motor Vehicles For Certain Institutions Of Higher Education; And To Declare An Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateNotification that SB651 is now Act 942
2019-04-09SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-09SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-08SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-08SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2019-04-08HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2019-04-08HouseEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-08HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2019-04-02HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-04-02HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-02SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-02SenateEMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
2019-04-02SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-01SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-26SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-26SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback