AR SB650 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-15 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Asset Limits For The Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program; And To Direct The Department Of Human Services To Request A Broad-based Categorical Eligibility Waiver.
Title
To Amend The Asset Limits For The Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program; And To Direct The Department Of Human Services To Request A Broad-based Categorical Eligibility Waiver.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-15 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Filed |