AR SB65 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that SB65 is now Act 639
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Notification that SB65 is now Act 639
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Regarding State Emission Plans For Fossil-fuel-fired Electric Generating Units.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Regarding State Emission Plans For Fossil-fuel-fired Electric Generating Units.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Ballinger [R] | Rep. Rick Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Notification that SB65 is now Act 639 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-03-10 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-03-10 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Filed |