AR SB65 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-3-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that SB65 is now Act 1227
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #7) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-3-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Notification that SB65 is now Act 1227
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #7) [PDF]
Summary
To Establish The Public School Choice Act Of 2013; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Establish The Public School Choice Act Of 2013; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 75 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Motion to reconsider vote Emergency Clause passed. (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED (Y: 75 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Motion to reconsider vote Emergency Clause passed. (Y: 79 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Emergency Clause failed of adoption. (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Senate | Notification that SB65 is now Act 1227 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-11 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Returned from the House having adopted the Emergency Clause |
2013-04-09 | House | Ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-09 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-04-09 | House | Motion to reconsider vote Emergency Clause passed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned From the Senate as requested. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Returned To the House as requested. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed as amended, Emergency Clause having Failed of Adoption |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned to the Senate as passed, as amended #1 with the Emergency Clause having failed of adoption. |
2013-04-08 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-04-08 | House | Emergency Clause failed of adoption. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-06 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-04-06 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2013-04-06 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2013-04-05 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2013-03-28 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2013-03-28 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-12 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Amendment # 5 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 5 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-03-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 4 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-02-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-02-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Filed |