AR SB644 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB644 is now Act 974
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB644 is now Act 974
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning The Investigation Of Violations Of Election Law; And To Establish An Election Law Violation Hotline.
Title
Concerning The Investigation Of Violations Of Election Law; And To Establish An Election Law Violation Hotline.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Hammer [R] | Rep. Jack Ladyman [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - House - Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Notification that SB644 is now Act 974 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-19 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-13 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-13 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | The vote by which SB644 Passed was expunged. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Motion to Expunge the Vote by which SB644 passed. Motion passed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Filed |