AR SB643 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Authority Of Municipalities To Tax Arkansas Wineries; And To Use Revenue From Wine Excise Taxes For The Production And Marketing Of Arkansas Wine And Wine Grapes.
Title
To Amend The Authority Of Municipalities To Tax Arkansas Wineries; And To Use Revenue From Wine Excise Taxes For The Production And Marketing Of Arkansas Wine And Wine Grapes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Died in House Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2017-03-30 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES |
2017-03-30 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2017-03-27 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |