AR SB640 | 2013 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that SB640 is now Act 1074
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Notification that SB640 is now Act 1074
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Authorize The Establishment Of Energy Improvement Districts To Fund Loans For Energy Efficiency Improvements, Renewable Energy Projects, And Water Conservation Improvements.
Title
To Authorize The Establishment Of Energy Improvement Districts To Fund Loans For Energy Efficiency Improvements, Renewable Energy Projects, And Water Conservation Improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Notification that SB640 is now Act 1074 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2013-04-08 | House | CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED |
2013-04-08 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2013-03-22 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE |
2013-03-21 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Amendment # 4 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 4 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Amendment # 2 AND 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 AND 3 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-03-05 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Filed |