AR SB64 | 2015 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
To Provide For An Enhanced Penalty For The Offense Of Driving While Intoxicated When A Person Causes An Accident Or Drives Without A Driver's License In Effect While Intoxicated.
Title
To Provide For An Enhanced Penalty For The Offense Of Driving While Intoxicated When A Person Causes An Accident Or Drives Without A Driver's License In Effect While Intoxicated.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Woods [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Died in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-09 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 3 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB64 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2015/2015R/Bills/SB64.pdf |