AR SB639 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Notification that SB639 is now Act 1054
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize Off-label Use Of Drug Treatments To Treat Patients Diagnosed With Pediatric Acute-onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome And Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated With Streptococcal Infection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize Off-label Use Of Drug Treatments To Treat Patients Diagnosed With Pediatric Acute-onset Neuropsychiatric Syndrome And Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders Associated With Streptococcal Infection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateNotification that SB639 is now Act 1054
2021-04-27SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-27SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-27SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-27SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-27SenateRules suspended.
2021-04-27SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2021-04-26SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2021-04-21SenateRe-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-04-21SenateReturned from the House as passed, as amended, Amendment #1.
2021-04-21HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2021-04-21HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-21HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-21HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2021-04-21HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2021-04-20HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2021-04-19HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2021-04-19HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-04-19SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-04-19SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-15SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2021-04-15SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on 2nd Reading for purpose of Amendment#1.
2021-04-13SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2021-04-06SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
2021-04-06SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?tbType=&id=sb639&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB639/SB639040620211332.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB639/SB639041520211346.pdf
Textftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/bills/2021R/Public/SB639/SB639042120211048.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2021R%2FPublic%2F&file=1054.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB639-S1.pdf
Amendmentftp://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/AMEND/2021R/Public/SB639-H1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB639&rcs=2853&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB639&rcs=3048&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB639&rcs=3158&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2021%2F2021R

Bill Comments 750

feedback