AR SB632 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Notification that SB632 is now Act 1085
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Authorize The Arkansas Economic Development Commission To Support A Cyber Alliance In Order To Reduce Cyber Risks And Encourage Economic Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Authorize The Arkansas Economic Development Commission To Support A Cyber Alliance In Order To Reduce Cyber Risks And Encourage Economic Development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateNotification that SB632 is now Act 1085
2019-04-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-15SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-10SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-10SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-10SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-10SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-09SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-04-08SenateRe-referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-04-08SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-08HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-08HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-05HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-05HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-05HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-04HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-04-03HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on ADVANCED COMMUNICATIONS AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY - HOUSE
2019-04-03HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-04-03SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-04-03SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-03SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-03SenateREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-03SenateAmendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
2019-03-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to TRANSPORTATION, TECHNOLOGY & LEGISLATIVE AFFAIRS - SENATE
2019-03-25SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback