AR SB632 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that SB632 is now Act 1070
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Notification that SB632 is now Act 1070
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Require Transparency, Reporting, And Disclosure To The Public Of Information Concerning Certain Construction Projects As Established By Law.
Title
To Require Transparency, Reporting, And Disclosure To The Public Of Information Concerning Certain Construction Projects As Established By Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Senate | Notification that SB632 is now Act 1070 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2017-03-31 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2017-03-27 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC TRANSPORTATION- HOUSE |
2017-03-27 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Transportation, Technology, and Legislative Affairs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |