AR SB628 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB628 is now Act 940
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Permit Arkansas-based Cigar Shops To Sell Cigars At Retail Online.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Permit Arkansas-based Cigar Shops To Sell Cigars At Retail Online.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateNotification that SB628 is now Act 940
2021-04-23SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2021-04-23SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2021-04-22SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2021-04-22SenateReturned from the House as passed.
2021-04-22HouseReturned To the Senate as passed.
2021-04-22HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2021-04-21HouseReturned by the Committee Do Pass
2021-04-14HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
2021-04-14HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2021-04-14SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2021-04-14SenateRead the third time and passed.
2021-04-13SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2021-04-05SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE
2021-04-05SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback