AR SB628 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify That An Accommodations Intermediary Is Required To Collect And Remit The Sales Tax And Tourism Tax Due On Arrangements The Accommodations Intermediary Makes For The Sale Or Use Of An Accommodation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify That An Accommodations Intermediary Is Required To Collect And Remit The Sales Tax And Tourism Tax Due On Arrangements The Accommodations Intermediary Makes For The Sale Or Use Of An Accommodation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-25SenateDied in Senate at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-04-02SenateWithdrawn by author.
2019-03-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-25SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE
2019-03-22SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback