AR SB628 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Clarify That An Accommodations Intermediary Is Required To Collect And Remit The Sales Tax And Tourism Tax Due On Arrangements The Accommodations Intermediary Makes For The Sale Or Use Of An Accommodation.
Title
To Clarify That An Accommodations Intermediary Is Required To Collect And Remit The Sales Tax And Tourism Tax Due On Arrangements The Accommodations Intermediary Makes For The Sale Or Use Of An Accommodation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Died in Senate at Sine Die adjournment. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn by author. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed |
Arkansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Pages/BillInformation.aspx?measureno=SB628 |
Text | http://arkleg.state.ar.us/assembly/2019/2019R/Bills/SB628.pdf |