AR SB627 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Dental Appliances.
Title
To Amend The Sales And Use Tax Exemption For Dental Appliances.
Sponsors
Sen. Bart Hester [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Sine Die adjournment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for study in the Interim Committee on REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Returned From the House as requested. |
2019-04-10 | House | Returned To the Senate as requested. |
2019-04-01 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on REVENUE & TAXATION- HOUSE |
2019-04-01 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to REVENUE & TAX - SENATE |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Filed |