AR SB624 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB624 is now Act 941
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB624 is now Act 941
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law Concerning Programs Providing Financial Assistance To Counties By The Department Of Veterans Affairs.
Title
To Amend The Law Concerning Programs Providing Financial Assistance To Counties By The Department Of Veterans Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Notification that SB624 is now Act 941 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-21 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-12 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-12 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to CITY, COUNTY & LOCAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed |