AR SB622 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Notification that SB622 is now Act 681
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Notification that SB622 is now Act 681
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Delaying Release From Prison For Certain Offenders Until The Offender Has Served At Least Eighty Percent (80%) Of His Or Her Sentence; Creating Penalties For False Reporting To Law Enforcement; And Creating A Registry.
Title
Delaying Release From Prison For Certain Offenders Until The Offender Has Served At Least Eighty Percent (80%) Of His Or Her Sentence; Creating Penalties For False Reporting To Law Enforcement; And Creating A Registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Affirm the ruling of the Speaker upheld (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Affirm the ruling of the Speaker upheld (Y: 61 N: 34 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Notification that SB622 is now Act 681 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned To the Senate as passed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-12 | House | Affirm the ruling of the Speaker upheld |
2021-04-12 | House | Objection was made - improperly reported out of committee - appeal presented to full House |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned by the Committee Do Pass |
2021-04-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2021-04-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Filed |