AR SB62 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Notification that SB62 is now Act 611
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Prohibit Public Entities From Contracting With Companies That Boycott Energy, Fossil Fuel, Firearms, And Ammunition Industries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Prohibit Public Entities From Contracting With Companies That Boycott Energy, Fossil Fuel, Firearms, And Ammunition Industries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - Third Reading (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11SenateNotification that SB62 is now Act 611
2023-04-07SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2023-04-07SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2023-04-06SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2023-04-06SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-04-06SenateRules suspended.
2023-04-06SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2023-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2023-04-06SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2023-04-05SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2023-04-05SenateReturned from the House as passed, as amended # 1
2023-04-05HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2023-04-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2023-04-04HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2023-04-04HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2023-04-04HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2023-04-03HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2023-03-09HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
2023-03-09HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2023-03-09SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2023-03-09SenateRead the third time and passed.
2023-03-08SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2023-01-17SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2023-01-17SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Detail?id=sb62&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB62.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FBills%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB62%2FSB62040420231006.pdf
Texthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Acts/FTPDocument?path=%2FACTS%2F2023R%2FPublic%2F&file=611.pdf&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Amendmenthttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/FTPDocument?path=%2FAMEND%2F2023R%2FPublic%2FSB62-H1.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB62&rcs=434&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB62&rcs=982&chamber=House&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R
Roll Callhttps://www.arkleg.state.ar.us/Bills/Votes?id=SB62&rcs=1107&chamber=Senate&ddBienniumSession=2023%2F2023R

Bill Comments

feedback