AR SB614 | 2021 | 93rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB614 is now Act 951
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Notification that SB614 is now Act 951
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Paid Canvassers; To Amend The Law Concerning The Compensation Of Paid Canvassers; And To Declare An Emergency.
Title
To Amend Arkansas Law Concerning Paid Canvassers; To Amend The Law Concerning The Compensation Of Paid Canvassers; And To Declare An Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | Senate | Notification that SB614 is now Act 951 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2021-04-22 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in House as amended, Amendment #1. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed as amended, Amendment #1. |
2021-04-14 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2021-04-14 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2021-04-13 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-13 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2021-04-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE |
2021-04-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Filed |