AR SB611 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Sine Die adjournment
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

To Clarify The Law Concerning Information Reported By Paid Canvassers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Clarify The Law Concerning Information Reported By Paid Canvassers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateSine Die adjournment
2019-04-25SenateDied in Senate Committee at Sine Die adjournment.
2019-03-27SenateRe-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-26SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-20SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
2019-03-20SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback