AR SB603 | 2019 | 92nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Notification that SB603 is now Act 1082
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

To Require The Department Of Education To Provide Certain Levels Of Support To Certain Public School Districts Based On Reading Scores; And To Amend The Purposes On Which National School Lunch State Categorical Funds May Be Spent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To Require The Department Of Education To Provide Certain Levels Of Support To Certain Public School Districts Based On Reading Scores; And To Amend The Purposes On Which National School Lunch State Categorical Funds May Be Spent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateNotification that SB603 is now Act 1082
2019-04-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
2019-04-15SenateReported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
2019-04-10SenateORDERED ENROLLED
2019-04-10SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-04-10SenateRules suspended.
2019-04-10SenateHouse Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on second reading for purpose of amendment.
2019-04-09SenateReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
2019-04-05SenateRe-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-04-05SenateReturned From the House as passed as amended.
2019-04-05HouseReturned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
2019-04-05HouseRead the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
2019-04-03HouseREPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
2019-04-03HouseAmendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
2019-04-03HousePlaced on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
2019-04-02HouseReturned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
2019-03-28HouseRead the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
2019-03-28HouseRECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
2019-03-28SenateOrdered immediately transmitted to the House.
2019-03-28SenateRead the third time and passed.
2019-03-27SenateReturned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
2019-03-19SenateRead first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
2019-03-19SenateFiled

Arkansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback