AR SB59 | 2023 | 94th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Notification that SB59 is now Act 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Notification that SB59 is now Act 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To Amend The Law With Respect To Circumstances That Justify The Use Of Physical Force Upon Another Person.
Title
To Amend The Law With Respect To Circumstances That Justify The Use Of Physical Force Upon Another Person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - Third Reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Senate | Notification that SB59 is now Act 165 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Returned From the House as passed, as amended # 1 |
2023-02-21 | House | Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 |
2023-02-21 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2023-02-20 | House | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-20 | House | Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-20 | House | Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-16 | House | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1 |
2023-02-07 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE |
2023-02-07 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately transmitted to the House. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Re-referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-02-01 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Filed |