AR SB59 | 2017 | 91st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Notification that SB59 is now Act 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-20 - Notification that SB59 is now Act 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act For The Department Of Education - Division Of Public School Academic Facilities And Transportation Appropriation For The 2017-2018 Fiscal Year.
Title
An Act For The Department Of Education - Division Of Public School Academic Facilities And Transportation Appropriation For The 2017-2018 Fiscal Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Read the third time and passed. (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Notification that SB59 is now Act 184 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | ORDERED ENROLLED |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Returned from the House as passed. |
2017-02-14 | House | Returned To Senate as Passed. |
2017-02-14 | House | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-14 | House | Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-02-14 | House | Considered in the Committee of the Whole, and recommended do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | RULES SUSPENDED |
2017-02-08 | House | Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR. |
2017-02-08 | House | RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Ordered Immediately transmitted to the House. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read the third time and passed. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Joint Budget Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Filed |